RI H7469 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEALTH AND SAFETY -- INTERSTATE COMPACT ON INDUSTRIALIZED/MODULAR BUILDINGS - Repeals the Interstate Compact on Industrialized/Modular Buildings in its entirety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the Interstate Compact on Industrialized/Modular Buildings in its entirety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage in concurrence (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28HouseSigned by Governor
2024-05-22HouseTransmitted to Governor
2024-05-21SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2024-05-17SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/21/2024)
2024-05-07SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2024-05-03SenateScheduled for consideration (05/07/2024)
2024-04-03SenateReferred to Senate Commerce
2024-03-21HouseHouse read and passed
2024-03-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/21/2024)
2024-03-14HouseCommittee recommends passage
2024-03-08HouseScheduled for consideration (03/14/2024)
2024-02-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2024)
2024-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House State Government & Elections

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback