RI H7464 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration At The University Of Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 Dollars For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration At The University Of Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 Dollars For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration.)
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7464.pdf |