RI H7460 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Michael P. Narducci to join Krystina M. D'Amario and Devin J. Noll in marriage on or about April 22, 2018, within the Town of North Kingstown, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-04-12HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-12SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2018)
2018-04-10SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-27SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseHouse read and passed
2018-02-27HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (03/01/2018)
2018-02-27HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback