RI H7449 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies the right of a surviving spouse of a decedent regarding elective shares taken against the decedent's will relating to real and personal estate to the estates of decedents dying on and after July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elective Share

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018)
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback