RI H7447 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a statutory framework for the licensing and regulation of genetic counselors.
Title
Genetic Counselors Licensing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. June Speakman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7447.pdf |