RI H7437 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/15/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/15/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the internet sale of lottery tickets with fifty percent of the proceeds to go to the state pension fund and fifty percent to go to the state lottery fund.
Title
State Lottery
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7437.pdf |