RI H7433 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a speed limit for school buses being driven on a limited access highway to ten (10) miles per hour less than the posted speed limit.
Title
School Bus Speed Limits
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7433.pdf |