RI H7433 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a special motor vehicle registration plate for The Rose Island Lighthouse Foundation, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-21HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-18HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018)
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback