RI H7432 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes nonprofit organizations to conduct gambling event fundraisers approved by the city or town in which the event is to be conducted and as authorized by the state police.
Title
Gambling And Lotteries
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7432.pdf |