RI H7431 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the traffic tribunal building on New London Avenue "The Albert E. DeRobbio Traffic Tribunal."
Title
Joint Committee On Naming New Buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7431.pdf |