RI H7430 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes 100% tax credit for disabled/elderly drivers age 65 and older for vehicle modification costs/training fees incurred necessary to retain their license/registration per rules/regs of tax administrator eff. 1/2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability And Elderly Driving Expenses Tax Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018)
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback