RI H7427 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the protections and remedies for employees against employers who pay wage differentials based on race, color, religion, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity or expression, disability; age or country of ancestral origin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Employment Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - Passage as amended lay on table (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-04-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-03-29HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/29/2018)
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-21HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/22/2018)
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback