RI H7425 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disbands the Smithfield Land Trust and transfers all function and real estate held by the Smithfield Land Trust to the town of Smithfield and Smithfield town council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Smithfield Land Trust

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018)
2018-02-20HouseMeeting postponed (03/01/2018)
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback