RI H7423 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the licensing requirements for certain shows or exhibitions occurring on Sundays with certain designated cities and/or towns.
Title
Shows And Exhibitions
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018) |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7423.pdf |