RI H7422 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires net neutrality by fixed or mobile broadband Internet access services.
Title
The Net Neutrality Protection Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7422.pdf |