RI H7419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the advertising of unhealthy food and beverage products in schools that do not meet minimum federal and state governmental nutrition standards.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2018-05-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-05-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2018) |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |