RI H7418 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - House voted to recommit to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires emergency generators in any elderly housing complex consisting of more than five (5) residential units in one building sufficient to operate a refrigerator and at least one other electrical outlet in each unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing For The Elderly--emergency Generators Required

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseHouse voted to recommit to House H.E.W.
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-05-30HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/30/2018)
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback