RI H7416 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a pharmacist to dispense a partial fill of a Schedule II controlled substance at the request of the patient or the prescriber.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies--partial Fills

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22SenateCommittee transferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2018-04-10HouseHouse read and passed
2018-04-06HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/10/2018)
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback