RI H7414 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits delivery service from using merchant's likeness/trademark or intellectual property on its website or delivery vehicles without written merchant consent. Requires delivery service to register to do business in Rhode Island.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7414.pdf |