RI H7413 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "out Of School Time Learning Commission" (creates A Permanent Joint Commission To Improve And Increase The Number Of Quality Out Of School Time Learning Programs In The State.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "out Of School Time Learning Commission" (creates A Permanent Joint Commission To Improve And Increase The Number Of Quality Out Of School Time Learning Programs In The State.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback