RI H7410 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a special motor vehicle registration plate for recipients of the United States Bronze Star Medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2020)
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback