RI H7406 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- SUPPLY CHAIN RELOCATION INCENTIVES - Provides tax credits to an entity that relocates any part of the United States supply chain to Rhode Island. This act also provides tax credits and incentives to an entity that re-shores manufacturing production lines to Rhode Island.
Title
Provides tax credits to an entity that relocates any part of the United States supply chain to Rhode Island. This act also provides tax credits and incentives to an entity that re-shores manufacturing production lines to Rhode Island.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7406.pdf |