RI H7403 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts veterans and active duty military from paying a toll on the Newport Bridge.
Title
Relating To Highways
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7403.pdf |