RI H7400 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/15/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a fee on companies that sell fossil fuels in Rhode Island and also establishes a receipt account to disburse the funds from.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energize Rhode Island: Clean Energy Investment And Carbon Pricing Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (05/15/2018)
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback