RI H7392 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires retail establishments with 3 or more employees on the premises without accessible public restroom to allow customers suffering from eligible conditions access to their employee restrooms.
Title
Restroom Access Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2022-03-24 | House | House read and passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/24/2022) |
2022-03-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/16/2022) |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |