RI H7390 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases penalties for damages to electric and communication lines from three thousand dollars ($3,000) to ten thousand dollars ($10,000); imprisonment from two (2) years to ten (10) years, or both and requires restitution for economic harm.
Title
Public Utilities
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7390.pdf |