RI H7388 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- RIGHT TO EARN A LIVING ACT - Establishes procedures to ensure agency regulations don't restrict individuals from businesses and professions, including home-based businesses, barbers, hairdressers and manicurists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes procedures to ensure agency regulations don't restrict individuals from businesses and professions, including home-based businesses, barbers, hairdressers and manicurists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024)
2024-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House State Government & Elections

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback