RI H7385 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the July 1, 2018, sunset clause in Chapters 325 and 406 of the 2013 Public Laws in regard to ยง 34-24-3.2 "mediation conference prior to mortgage foreclosure."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale--mediation Conference

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-21HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-03-28HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-28HouseMeeting postponed (02/28/2018)
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback