RI H7384 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GENERAL ASSEMBLY -- PERMANENT JOINT COMMITTEE ON NAMING ALL NEW BUILDINGS, BRIDGES, EDIFICES AND OTHER STATE CONSTRUCTIONS - Renames the "Roosevelt Benton Youth Assessment Center" as the "Roosevelt Benton Center".
Title
Renames the "Roosevelt Benton Youth Assessment Center" as the "Roosevelt Benton Center".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2024-04-04 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Subjects
General Assembly
GENERAL ASSEMBLY -- PERMANENT JOINT COMMITTEE ON NAMING ALL NEW BUILDINGS, BRIDGES, EDIFICES AND OTHER STATE CONSTRUCTIONS
GENERAL ASSEMBLY -- PERMANENT JOINT COMMITTEE ON NAMING ALL NEW BUILDINGS, BRIDGES, EDIFICES AND OTHER STATE CONSTRUCTIONS