RI H7383 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates the RITBA to design a safety barrier or netting system on the Mount Hope Bridge, the Claiborne Pell Bridge, and the Jamestown Verrazzano Bridge by April 1, 2022, with construction commencing no later than January 1, 2023.
Title
Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7383.pdf |