RI H7382 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an exemption, for private detectives and private security guards, from the law banning nontransparent windshields and windows.
Title
Nontransparent Windshields And Windows
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7382.pdf |