RI H7380 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the procedure for holding annual meeting, special meetings, election, recall and duties of the board of directors and officers, as well as the duties of the tax assessor, district clerk, finance director-treasurer and tax collector.
Title
Relating To The Central Coventry Fire District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7380.pdf |