RI H7379 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts self-employed sole practicing investigators operating independently from any partnership, corporation, limited liability company or association from the sales tax imposed on services.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7379.pdf |