RI H7377 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes elected school committees if a majority of qualified electors of the said city of Providence vote in a special elections before July 1, 2026.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7377.pdf |