RI H7377 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Relieves municipal police and firefighter bargaining representatives from their obligation to represent employees in grievances/arbitrations if they were not members of the bargaining unit within the 90 days prior to the events that caused the grievance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Police And Firefighters' Arbitration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Labor
2018-06-05HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-31HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-03-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback