RI H7376 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relieves state employee bargaining representatives from their obligation to represent employees in grievances/arbitrations if they were not members of the bargaining unit in the ninety (90) days prior to the events that caused the grievance.
Title
Organization Of State Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7376.pdf |