RI H7375 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Amending The Membership And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Assess And Make Recommendations On The Educational Needs Of Children With Dyslexia And/or Reading Disabilities (increases Membership To 13 And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of Commission To Assess And Make Recommendations On The Educational Needs Of Children With Dyslexia And/or Reading Disabilities, To February 7, 2019, And Expires On May 7, 2019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Amending The Membership And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Assess And Make Recommendations On The Educational Needs Of Children With Dyslexia And/or Reading Disabilities (increases Membership To 13 And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of Commission To Assess And Make Recommendations On The Educational Needs Of Children With Dyslexia And/or Reading Disabilities, To February 7, 2019, And Expires On May 7, 2019.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/16/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-03-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06HouseMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback