RI H7374 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that no city or town would issue a permit for the construction of new buildings that are not an all-electric building, if the initial application for a permit was submitted after December 31, 2023, unless certain circumstances apply.
Title
All-electric Building Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7374.pdf |