RI H7372 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires pharmacies to accept any manufacturer's drug discount card, and pass said discount to the consumer, without requiring the consumer to seek reimbursement from the drug manufacturer directly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback