RI H7369 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a RI Prevention, Health Promotion, and Public Health Council. This council would provide coordination and leadership among all state departments with respect to prevention, wellness and health promotion practices
Title
Rhode Island Prevention, Health Promotion, And Public Health Council
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2014) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7369.pdf |