RI H7368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the Rhode Island Access to Medical Technology Innovation Act.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | House | House passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B as amended |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2014-05-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-04-16 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2014) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |