RI H7367 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows school committees and the Rhode Island Society of Technology Educators ("RISTE") to enter into joint purchase agreements for the purchase of technology and IT infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HouseSenate voted to reconsider
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/13/2018)
2018-04-11HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018)
2018-03-12HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2018-01-31HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback