RI H7367 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school committees and the Rhode Island Society of Technology Educators ("RISTE") to enter into joint purchase agreements for the purchase of technology and IT infrastructure.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Senate voted to reconsider |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2018) |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |