RI H7366 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Rearranges, restates, and further amends the act of 1856 incorporating The Juniper Hill Cemetery in the town of Bristol, as amended.
Title
Relating To The Juniper Hill Cemetery, Amending And Incorporating The Original Act Of Incorporation Passed At The January, 1856 Session Of The General Assembly As Subsequently Amended At The January, 1884, And The January, 1887 Sessions, And Now Further Amended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2018-05-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |