RI H7365 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows deduction from electric rate tariff to municipalities for streetlights not providing lighting due to capping or malfunction.
Title
Municipal Streetlight Investment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7365.pdf |