RI H7362 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides uninsured and/or uninspected vehicles not operated within this or any state may avoid suspension/revocation registration if plates removed. Violators subject to fine up to $150.
Title
Motor Vehicle Reparations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7362.pdf |