RI H7361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declares null/void contract between credit card issuers/vendors/businesses prohibiting reduced price for customers paying in cash.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7361.pdf |