RI H7359 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a minor sixteen (16) years of age or older to receive a tattoo on his or her body if they are accompanied by a parent or legal guardian who gives consent to the tattooing of the minor.
Title
Children
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/17/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7359.pdf |