RI H7356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the division of planning create a checklist of environmental and energy issues that certain state construction projects which cost in excess of $10,000,000 would need to consider and address.
Title
State Construction Projects Metrics
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7356.pdf |