RI H7350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the city of Newport to regulate motorized tricycles in a similar manner as the town of New Shoreham.
Title
Regulation Of Rental Of Motorized Bicycles, Motor Scooters And Motorized Tricycles In New Shoreham
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2022-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |